Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20A95
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20A95
Title:Kevin Robinson, et al., Applicants
v.
Phil Murphy, Governor of New Jersey, et al.
Docketed:November 25, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3048)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 25 2020Application (20A95) for injunctive relief, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 28 2020Response to application (20A95) requested by Justice Alito, due Thursday, December 3, by 6 p.m.
Dec 03 2020Response to application from respondents Phil Murphy, et al. filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Dec 03 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by American Medical Association, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Dec 04 2020Reply of applicants Kevin Robinson, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Dec 15 2020Application (20A95) referred to the Court.
Dec 15 2020The application for injunctive relief, presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court, is treated as a petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment, and the petition is granted. The October 2 order of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey is vacated, and the case is remanded to the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit with instructions to remand to the District Court for further consideration in light of Roman Catholic Diocese of Brooklyn v. Cuomo, 592 U. S. ___ (2020).
Jan 19 2021JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Stephen M. Crampton
    Counsel of Record
Thomas More Society
309 W. Washington Street
Suite 1250
Chicago, IL 60606

smcrampton@hotmail.com
(312) 782-1680
Party name: Reverend Kevin Robinson, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeremy Michael Feigenbaum
    Counsel of Record
Office of the New Jersey Attorney General
25 Market Street
Trenton, NJ 08611

jeremy.feigenbaum@njoag.gov
(609) 292-4925
Party name: Philip Murphy, et al.
Other
Henry Clay Quillen
    Counsel of Record
Whatley Kallas LLP
152 West 57th Street
41st Floor
New York, NY 10019

hquillen@whatleykallas.com
2124477060
Party name: American Medical Association; Medical Society of New Jersey

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543