Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20A71
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20A71
Title:Patsy J. Wise, et al., Applicants
v.
Damon Circosta, Chair, State Board of Elections, et al.
Docketed:October 22, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2104)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 22 2020Application (20A71) for injunctive relief, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Oct 22 2020Response to application (20A71) requested by The Chief Justice, due Saturday, October 24, by 3 p.m.
Oct 24 2020Response to application from respondents Damon Circosta, Chair, State Board of Elections, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 24 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by True the Vote.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Oct 24 2020Response to application from respondents North Carolina Alliance for Retired Americans, et al. filed.
Main DocumentMain Document
Oct 24 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by District of Columbia, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 24 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Democracy North Carolina, et al.
Main Document
Oct 25 2020Reply of applicants Patsy J. Wise, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Oct 28 2020Application (20A71) referred to the Court.
Oct 28 2020Application (20A71) denied by the Court. The application for injunctive relief presented to The Chief Justice and by him referred to the Court is denied. Justice Thomas, Justice Alito, and Justice Gorsuch would grant the application on the issue of the ballot-receipt deadline. Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration or decision of this application.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Bobby Burchfield
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

bburchfield@kslaw.com
202-626-5524
Party name: Patsy J. Wise, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ryan Young Park
    Counsel of Record
North Carolina Department of Justice
P.O. Box 629
Raleigh, NC 27602

rpark@ncdoj.gov
9197166900
Party name: Damon Circosta, in his official capacity as Chair of the State Board of Elections, et al.
Other
Loren L. AliKhan
    Counsel of Record
D.C. Office of the Attorney General
400 6th Street, NW, Suite 8100
Washington, DC 20001

loren.alikhan@dc.gov
202-727-6287
Party name: District of Columbia
Paul Reinherz Quitman Wolfson
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr, LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

paul.wolfson@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: Democracy North Carolina, et al.
Marc Erik Elias
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Cole, LLP
700 13th St, NW
Ste. 800
Washington, DC 20005-3960

melias@perkinscoie.com
202-654-6200
Party name: North Carolina Alliance for Retired Americans, Barker Fowler, Becky Johnson, Jade Jurek, Rosalyn Kociemba, Tom Kociemba, Sandra Malone and Caren Rabinowitz
James Bopp Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Bopp Law Firm, PC
The National Building
1 South Sixth Street
Terre Haute, IN 47807

jboppjr@aol.com
8122322434
Party name: True the Vote, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543