Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20A70
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 20A70
Title:Laddy Curtis Valentine, et al., Applicants
v.
Bryan Collier, Executive Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, et al.
Docketed:October 21, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-20525)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 21 2020Application (20A70) to vacate stay pending appeal, submitted to Justice Alito.
Lower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherMain Document
Oct 21 2020Emergency Application to Justice Alito to Vacate Stay Pending Appeal of Permanent Injunction Entered by the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit of Laddy Curtis Valentine, et al. not accepted for filing. (November 04, 2020)
Oct 26 2020Response to application (20A70) requested by Justice Alito, due Monday, November 2, by 2 p.m.
Nov 02 2020Response to application from respondents Bryan Collier, et al. filed.
Main Document
Nov 04 2020Reply of applicants Laddy Curtis Valentine, et al. filed.
Reply
Nov 16 2020Application (20A70) referred to the Court.
Nov 16 2020Application (20A70) denied by the Court. The application to vacate stay presented to JUSTICE ALITO and by him referred to the Court is denied. JUSTICE SOTOMAYOR, with whom JUSTICE KAGAN joins, dissenting from the denial of application to vacate stay. (Detached Opinion).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Brandon W. Duke
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn LLP
800 Capitol Street
Suite 2400
Houston, TX 77002-5242

bduke@winston.com
7136512636
Party name: Laddy Curtis Valentine, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: Bryan Collier, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543