Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20A67
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20A67
Title:John H. Merrill, Alabama Secretary of State, et al., Applicants
v.
People First of Alabama, et al.
Docketed:October 15, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-13695)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 15 2020Application (20A67) for a stay, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 16 2020Response to application (20A67) requested by Justice Thomas, due Monday, October 19, by noon.
Oct 19 2020Response to application from respondents People First of Alabama, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceProof of Service
Oct 19 2020Reply of applicants John H. Merrill, Alabama Secretary of State, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Oct 19 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by District of Columbia, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 19 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by American Diabetes Association, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 19 2020Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief of League of Women Voters of Alabama and American Association of University Women not accepted for filing. (October 21, 2020)
Oct 21 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by League of Women Voters of Alabama, et al.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Oct 21 2020Application (20A67) referred to the Court.
Oct 21 2020Application (20A67) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to JUSTICE THOMAS and by him referred to the Court is granted, and the district court’s September 30, 2020 order granting a permanent injunction is stayed pending disposition of the appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit and disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, if such writ is timely sought. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. JUSTICE SOTOMAYOR, with whom JUSTICE BREYER and JUSTICE KAGAN join, dissenting from grant of stay. (Detached Opinion).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Ave
Montgomery, AL 36130

edmund.lacour@alabamaag.gov
334-353-2196
Party name: John H. Merrill, Alabama Secretary of State, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Nancy Gbana AbuduSouthern Poverty Law Center
PO Box 1287
Decatur, GA 30031

nancy.abudu@splcenter.org
404-521-6700
Party name: People First of Alabama, et al.
Natasha Clarise Merle
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.
40 Rector Street
New York, NY 10006

nmerle@naacpldf.org
2129652234
Party name: People First of Alabama, et al.
Other
Demian Alexander Ordway
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
425 Lexington Avenue, 14th Floor
14th Floor
New York, NY 10017

dordway@hsgllp.com
646-837-5151
Party name: American Diabetes Association, et al.
Michael Courtney Keats
    Counsel of Record
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP
One New York Plaza
New York, NY 10004

michael.keats@friedfrank.com
(212) 859-8914
Party name: League of Women Voters of Alabama and American Association of University Women
Loren L. AliKhan
    Counsel of Record
D.C. Office of the Attorney General
Office of the Solicitor General
400 6th Street, NW, Suite 8100
Washington, DC 20001

loren.alikhan@dc.gov
202-727-6287
Party name: District of Columbia

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543