Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20A62
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20A62
Title:Wilbur Ross, Secretary of Commerce, et al., Applicants
v.
National Urban League, et al.
Docketed:October 7, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-16868)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 07 2020Application (20A62) for a stay, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Proof of ServiceMain DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Oct 08 2020Response to application (20A62) requested by Justice Kagan, due Saturday, October 10, 2020, by 10 a.m. ET.
Oct 10 2020Response to application from respondents National Urban League, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 10 2020Reply of applicants Wilbur Ross, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceReply
Oct 13 2020Application (20A62) referred to the Court.
Oct 13 2020Application (20A62) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to JUSTICE KAGAN and by her referred to the Court is granted. The district court’s September 24, 2020 order granting a preliminary injunction is stayed pending disposition of the appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit and disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, if such writ is timely sought. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. JUSTICE SOTOMAYOR, dissenting from grant of stay.(Detached Opinion).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Wilbur L. Ross, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Melissa Arbus Sherry
    Counsel of Record
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

melissa.sherry@lw.com
202-637-3386
Party name: National Urban League, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543