Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20A55
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20A55
Title:Marci Andino, et al., Applicants
v.
Kylon Middleton, et al.
Docketed:October 1, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2022)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 01 2020Application (20A55) for a stay, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
Oct 01 2020Response to application (20A55) requested by The Chief Justice, due Saturday, October 3, 2020, by 2 p.m. ET.
Oct 03 2020Response to application from respondents Kylon Middleton, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 03 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by District of Columbia, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 03 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by AARP, et al.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Oct 03 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Mary Thomas, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 04 2020Reply of applicants Marci Andino, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Oct 05 2020Application (20A55) referred to the Court.
Oct 05 2020Application (20A55) granted in part by the Court. The application for stay presented to THE CHIEF JUSTICE and by him referred to the Court is granted in part, and the district court’s September 18, 2020 order granting a prelim-inary injunction is stayed pending disposition of the appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit and disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, if such writ is timely sought. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judg-ment of this Court. The order is stayed except to the extent that any ballots cast before this stay issues and received within two days of this order may not be rejected for failing to comply with the witness requirement. JUSTICE THOMAS, JUSTICE ALITO, and JUSTICE GORSUCH would grant the application in full. JUSTICE KAVANAUGH, concurring in grant of application for stay. (Detached Opinion).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
William Grayson Lambert
    Counsel of Record
Burr & Forman LLP
PO Box 11390
Columbia, SC 29211

glambert@burr.com
803-799-9800
Party name: Marci Andino, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Marc Erik Elias
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Cole, LLP
700 13th St, NW
Ste. 600
Washington, DC 20005-3960

melias@perkinscoie.com
202-434-1609
Party name: Kyle Middleton, et al.
Other
Adriel I. Cepeda Derieux
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

ACepedaDerieux@aclu.org
(212) 549-2500
Party name: Mary Thomas, et al.
Loren L. AliKhan
    Counsel of Record
D.C. Office of the Attorney General
Solicitor General
400 6th Street, NW, Suite 8100
Washington, DC 20001

loren.alikhan@dc.gov
202-727-6287
Party name: District of Columbia
Daniel Benjamin Kohrman
    Counsel of Record
AARP AND AARP FOUNDATION
601 E STREET NW
Washington, DC 20049

dkohrman@aarp.org
202-434-2064
Party name: AARP and AARP FOUNDATION

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543