Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20A53
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20A53
Title:Joseph B. Scarnati, III, et al., Applicants
v.
Kathy Boockvar, Secretary of Pennsylvania, et al.
Docketed:September 28, 2020
Linked with 20-542
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Middle District
   Case Numbers:(133 MM 2020)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 28 2020Application (20A53) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 29 2020Response to application (20A53) requested by Justice Alito, due Monday, October 5, by 3 p.m.
Sep 30 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Bryan Cutler, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 02 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Tom Ridge, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Oct 05 2020Response to application from respondents Kathy Boockvar, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 05 2020Response to application from respondent Luzerne County Election Board filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 05 2020Response to application from respondents Pennsylvania Democratic Party, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 05 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Oklahoma, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 05 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Oct 05 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Christian Family Coalition Florida, Inc.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Oct 06 2020Reply of applicants Joseph B. Scarnati III, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Oct 19 2020Application (20A53) referred to the Court.
Oct 19 2020Application (20A53) denied by the Court. Justice Thomas, Justice Alito, Justice Gorsuch, and Justice Kavanaugh would grant the application.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
15405 John Marshall Hwy
Haymarket, VA 20169

Jtorchinsky@hvjt.law
540 341 8808
Party name: Joseph B. Scarnati III, President Pro Tempore, And Jake Corman, Majority Leader Of The Pennsylvania Senate
Attorneys for Respondents
Joseph Matthias Cosgrove
    Counsel of Record
Selingo Guagliardo LLC
345 Market Street
Kingston, PA 18704

jmcosgro@msn.com
570-287-2400
Party name: Luzerne County Election Board
Clifford Benjamin Levine
    Counsel of Record
Dentons Cohen & Grigsby P.C.
625 Liberty Avenue
Pittsburgh, PA 15222

clevine@cohenlaw.com
412-297-4998
Party name: Pennsylvania Democratic Party, et al.
John Bartley DeLone
    Counsel of Record
Attorney General's Office
Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General -Appellate Litigation Section
15th Floor, Strawberry Square
Harrisburg, PA 17120

jdelone@attorneygeneral.gov
717-783-3226
Party name: Kathy Boockvar
Other
Laurie Webb Daniel
    Counsel of Record
Webb and Daniel
One Atlantic Ctr., Suite 3100
1201 W. Peachtree St., NW
Atlanta, GA 30309-3400

laurie.daniel@hklaw.com
4044336430
Party name: Bryan Cutler, Speaker of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives, and Kerry Benninghoff, Majority Leader of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives
Richard Douglas Bernstein
    Counsel of Record
1875 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

rbernsteinlaw@gmail.com
3017752064
Party name: Tom Ridge, Peter Keisler, Carter Phillips, Stuart Gerson, Christine Todd Whitman
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma et al.
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
Dennis Grossman
    Counsel of Record
6701 Sunset Drive
Suite 104
Miami, FL 33143

dagrossmanlaw@aol.com
5164666690
Party name: Christian Family Coalition (CFC) Florida, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543