Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20A34
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20A34
Title:Food and Drug Administration, et al., Applicants
v.
American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, et al.
Docketed:August 26, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1824)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 26 2020Application (20A34) for a stay, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 27 2020Response to application (20A34) requested by The Chief Justice, due Tuesday, September 8, by noon.
Aug 28 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Indiana, et al.
Main DocumentOtherOtherProof of Service
Sep 08 2020Response to application from respondents American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 08 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by New York, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Sep 08 2020Brief of Amici Curiae Medical Associations in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Application for Stay Pending Appeal of Medical Associations not accepted for filing. (September 08, 2020)
Sep 08 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by American Medical Association, et al.
Main Document
Sep 10 2020Reply of applicants Food and Drug Administration, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Oct 08 2020Application (20A34) referred to the Court.
Oct 08 2020The Government seeks a stay of an injunction preventing the Food and Drug Administration from enforcing in-person dispensation requirements for the drug mifepristone during the pendency of the public health emergency. The Government argues that, at a minimum, the injunction is overly broad in scope, given that it applies nationwide and for an indefinite duration regardless of the improving conditions in any individual State. Without indicating this Court’s views on the merits of the District Court’s order or injunction, a more comprehensive record would aid this Court’s review. The Court will therefore hold the Government’s ap-plication in abeyance to permit the District Court to promptly consider a motion by the Government to dissolve, modify, or stay the injunction, including on the ground that relevant circumstances have changed. See Febre v. United States, 396 U. S. 1225, 1225–1226 (1969) (Harlan, J., in chambers); see also Parr v. United States, 351 U. S. 513, 520 (1956). The District Court should rule within 40 days of receiving the Government’s submission. JUSTICE ALITO, with whom JUSTICE THOMAS joins, dissenting. (Detached Opinion).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Food and Drug Administration, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Julia Heather Kaye
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

jkaye@aclu.org
212-549-2633
Party name: American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, et al.
Other
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: New York, et al.
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
IGC South, Fifth Floor
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: State of Indiana, et al.
Kimberly A. Parker
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer, Cutler & Pickering
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

kimberly.parker@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6987
Party name: Medical Associations

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543