Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20A21
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20A21
Title:Beverly Clarno, Oregon Secretary of State, Applicant
v.
People Not Politicians Oregon, et al.
Docketed:July 30, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-35630)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 30 2020Application (20A21) for a stay, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 30 2020Response to application (20A21) requested by Justice Kagan, due Tuesday, August 4, 2020, by 4 p.m. ET.
Aug 04 2020Response to application from respondents People Not Politicians Oregon, et al. filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Aug 05 2020Reply of applicant Beverly Clarno, Oregon Secretary of State filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Aug 07 2020Supplemental brief requested by Justice Kagan. The applicant, Secretary of State Beverly Clarno, is directed to file a supplemental brief by 8 p.m. ET today, August 7, 2020, addressing the following question: Whether the Secretary of State consents to the Oregon Attorney General’s appearance on her behalf in proceedings in this Court. The brief is not to exceed 100 words. Any supplemental brief filed by respondents in response must be filed by 12 p.m. ET on Monday, August 10, and may not exceed 100 words.
Aug 07 2020Supplemental brief of applicant Beverly Clarno, Oregon Secretary of State filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 10 2020Supplemental brief of respondents People Not Politicians Oregon, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 11 2020Application (20A21) referred to the Court.
Aug 11 2020Application (20A21) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to Justice Kagan and by her referred to the Court is granted. The district court’s July 10 and July 13, 2020 orders granting a preliminary injunction are stayed pending disposition of the appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit and disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, if such writ is timely sought. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. Justice Ginsburg and Justice Sotomayor would deny the application.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Benjamin Noah Gutman
    Counsel of Record
Oregon Department of Justice
1162 Court Street NE
Salem, OR 97301

benjamin.gutman@doj.state.or.us
503-378-4402
Party name: Beverly Clarno, Oregon Secretary of State
Attorneys for Respondents
Jay Newman Rapaport
    Counsel of Record
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
633 Battery Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

jrapaport@keker.com
415-391-5400
Party name: People Not Politicians Oregon, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543