Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20A18
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20A18
Title:Bradley Little, Governor of Idaho, et al., Applicants
v.
Reclaim Idaho, et al.
Docketed:July 16, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-35584)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 14 2020Application (20A18) for a stay, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 17 2020Response to application (20A18) requested by Justice Kagan, due Tuesday, July 21, 2020, by 5 p.m. ET.
Jul 21 2020Response to application from respondents Reclaim Idaho, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Reply of applicants Bradley Little, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Jul 30 2020Application (20A18) referred to the Court.
Jul 30 2020Application (20A18) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to JUSTICE KAGAN and by her referred to the Court is granted. The district court’s June 23, June 26, and June 30, 2020 orders are stayed pending disposition of the appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit and disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, if such writ is timely sought. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. CHIEF JUSTICE ROBERTS, with whom JUSTICE ALITO, JUSTICE GORSUCH, and JUSTICE KAVANAUGH join, concurring in the grant of stay. (Detached Opinion). JUSTICE SOTOMAYOR, with whom JUSTICE GINSBURG joins, dissenting from the grant of stay. (Detached Opinion).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Robert Arthur Berry
    Counsel of Record
State of Idaho Attorney General's Office
954 W. Jefferson, 2nd Floor
PO Box 83720
Boise, ID 83720

robert.berry@ag.idaho.gov
2083344541
Party name: Bradley Little, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Deborah A. Ferguson
    Counsel of Record
Ferguson Durham, PLLC
223 N. 6th St.
Suite 325
Boise, ID 83702

daf@fergusondurham.com
2084842235
Party name: Reclaim Idaho, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543