Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20A161 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20A161 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Oklahoma, Applicant
v.
Shaun Michael Bosse
Docketed:April 26, 2021
Linked with 21-186
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PCD-2019-124)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 26 2021Application (20A161) for a stay of mandate, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 27 2021Response to application (20A161) requested by Justice Gorsuch, due Friday, May 7, by 3 p.m. ET.
May 07 2021Response to application from respondent Shaun Michael Bosse filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 07 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Chickasaw Nation.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
May 12 2021Reply of applicant Oklahoma filed.
ReplyProof of Service
May 17 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by United States.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
May 21 2021Supplemental brief of applicant Oklahoma filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 26 2021Application (20A161) referred to the Court.
May 26 2021Application (20A161) granted by the Court. The application to stay the mandate of the Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma, case No. PCD-2019-124, presented to Justice Gorsuch and by him referred to the Court is granted pending the timely filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the issuance of the mandate of this Court. Justice Breyer, Justice Sotomayor, and Justice Kagan would deny the application.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: State of Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
Zachary Charles Schauf
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ZSchauf@jenner.com
202-637-6379
Party name: Shaun Michael Bosse
Other
Frank Sharp Holleman IV
    Counsel of Record
Sonosky, Chambers, Sachse, Endreson & Perry, LLP
1425 K Street NW, Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

fholleman@sonosky.com
2026820240
Party name: Chickasaw Nation
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543