Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20A150
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20A150
Title:Texas, et al., Applicants
v.
Cook County, Illinois, et al.
Docketed:March 26, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3150)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 19 2021Application (20A150) for a stay pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 26 2021Response to application (20A150) requested by The Chief Justice, due Friday, April 9, 2021, by 5 p.m. ET.
Apr 09 2021Response to application from respondents Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 09 2021Response to application from respondents Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Secretary of Homeland Security, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 13 2021Reply of applicants Texas, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Apr 26 2021Application (20A150) referred to the Court.
Apr 26 2021In 2019, the Department of Homeland Security promulgated through notice and comment a rule defining the term “public charge.” The District Court in this case vacated the rule nationwide, but that judgment was stayed pending DHS’s appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit. On March 9, 2021, following the change in presidential administration, DHS voluntarily dismissed that appeal, thereby dissolving the stay of the District Court’s judgment. And on March 15, DHS relied on the District Court’s now-effective judgment to remove the challenged rule from the Code of Federal Regulations without going through notice and comment rulemaking. Shortly after DHS had voluntarily dismissed its appeal, a group of States sought leave to intervene in the Court of Appeals. When that request was denied, the States filed an application for leave to intervene in this Court and for a stay of the District Court’s judgment. The States argue that DHS has prevented enforcement of the rule while insulating the District Court’s judgment from review. The States also contend that DHS has rescinded the rule without following the requirements of the Administrative Procedure Act. We deny the application, without prejudice to the States raising these and other arguments before the District Court, whether in a motion for intervention or otherwise. After the District Court considers any such motion, the States may seek review, if necessary, in the Court of Appeals, and in a renewed application in this Court. Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration or decision of this application.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Texas, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jessica Megan Scheller
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Cook County State's Attorney
500 Richard J. Daley Center Place, 5th Floor
Chicago, IL 60602

jessica.scheller@cookcountyil.gov
3126036934
Party name: Cook County, et al.
Tacy Fletcher Flint
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
One South Dearborn Street
Chicago, IL 60603

tflint@sidley.com
(312) 853-7875
Party name: Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc.
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543