Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20A138
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20A138
Title:Gateway City Church, et al., Applicants
v.
Gavin Newsom, Governor of California, et al.
Docketed:February 17, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-15189)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 17 2021Application (20A138) for injunctive relief, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 18 2021Response to application (20A138) requested by Justice Kagan, due Wednesday, February 24, by 4 p.m. ET.
Feb 24 2021Response to application from respondents County of Santa Clara, et al. filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Feb 24 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Roman Catholic Bishop of San Jose.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Feb 24 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Caroline M. Corbin, et al.
OtherProof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 24 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Calvary Chapel San Jose, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 25 2021Reply of applicants Gateway City Church, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Feb 25 2021Letter of respondents County of Santa Clara, et al. received.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 26 2021Application (20A138) referred to the Court.
Feb 26 2021Application (20A138) granted by the Court. The application for injunctive relief presented to Justice Kagan and by her referred to the Court is granted pending disposition of the appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit and disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, if such writ is timely sought. The Ninth Circuit’s failure to grant relief was erroneous. This outcome is clearly dictated by this Court’s decision in South Bay United Pentecostal Church v. Newsom, 592 U. S. ___ (2021). Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this order shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the order shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. Justice Kagan, with whom Justice Breyer and Justice Sotomayor join, dissenting: I dissent for the reasons set out in South Bay United Pentecostal Church v. Newsom, 592 U. S. ___ (2021) (Kagan, J., dissenting). (Detached Opinion).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kevin T. Snider
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Justice Institute
P.O. Box 276600
Sacramento, CA 95827-6600

ksnider@pji.org
(916) 857-6900
Party name: Gateway City Church, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
James Robyzad Williams
    Counsel of Record
Office of the County Counsel, County of Santa Clara
70 W. Hedding Street, 9th Floor, East Wing
San Jose, CA 95110

james.williams@cco.sccgov.org
4082995901
Party name: County of Santa Clara and Sara H. Cody, MD
Other
Eric Christopher Rassbach
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1919 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

erassbach@becketlaw.org
2029550095
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Joseph Russell Palmore
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2100 L Street, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20037

jpalmore@mofo.com
202-887-6940
Party name: Church-State Scholars

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543