Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20A105
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20A105
Title:High Plains Harvest Church, et al., Applicants
v.
Jared Polis, Governor of Colorado, et al.
Docketed:December 4, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1280)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 04 2020Application (20A105) for injunctive relief, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main Document
Dec 04 2020Response to application (20A105) requested by Justice Gorsuch, due Wednesday, December 9, by 4 p.m. ET.
Dec 04 2020Exhibits of High Plains Harvest Church, et al. not accepted for filing. (February 03, 2021)
Dec 09 2020Response to application from respondents Jared Polis, et al. filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Dec 11 2020Reply of applicants High Plains Harvest Church, et al. filed.
Reply
Dec 15 2020Application (20A105) referred to the Court.
Dec 15 2020The application for injunctive relief, presented to JUSTICE GORSUCH and by him referred to the Court, is treated as a petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment, and the petition is granted. The August 10 order of the United States District Court for the District of Colorado is vacated, and the case is remanded to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit with instructions to remand to the District Court for further consideration in light of Roman Catholic Diocese of Brooklyn v. Cuomo, 592 U. S. ___ (2020). JUSTICE KAGAN, with whom JUSTICE BREYER and JUSTICE SOTOMAYOR join, dissenting. (Detached opinion)
Jan 19 2021JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Barry Kevin Arrington
    Counsel of Record
Arrington Law Firm
3801 East Florida Avenue,Suite 830
Denver, CO 80210

barry@arringtonpc.com
3032057870
Party name: High Plains Harvest Church, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Eric Reuel Olson
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
1300 Broadway
10th Floor
Denver, CO 80203

eric.olson@coag.gov
7205086548
Party name: Jared Polis, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543