SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-998
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-998
Title:
Mama Jo’s, Inc., dba Berries, Petitioner
v.
Sparta Insurance Company
Docketed:
January 26, 2021
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Case Numbers:
(18-12887)
Decision Date:
August 18, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 15 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 25, 2021)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 25 2021
Brief amicus curiae of United Policyholders filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 10 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 29 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Leonardo H. Da Silva II
Counsel of Record
Alvarez, Feltman, Da Silva and Costa P.L.
2525 SW 27th Avenue, Suite 200
Miami, FL 33133
leo@afdlegal.com
305-915-5904
Party name: Mama Jo’s, Inc. d/b/a Berries
Other
Lorelie Sue Masters
Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20037
lmasters@huntonak.com
2029551851
Party name: United Policyholders
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##