Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-98
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-98
Title:Thomas Wood, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Philip Talmadge Wood, Petitioner
v.
The Boeing Co.
Docketed:July 30, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-7193, 18-7195, 18-7196, 18-7197, 18-7198)
   Decision Date:January 10, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:February 28, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 27 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 31, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 27 2020Waiver of right of respondent The Boeing Co. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 31 2020Brief amici curiae of Legal Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Evan Andrew Young
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
98 San Jacinto Boulevard
Suite 1500
Austin, TX 78701-4078

evan.young@bakerbotts.com
5123222506
Party name: Thomas C. Wood, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Philip Talmadge Wood
Attorneys for Respondent
Eric B. Wolff
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
1201 Third Avenue
Suite 4900
Seattle, WA 98101-3029

ewolff@perkinscoie.com
206-359-8000
Party name: The Boeing Co.
Other
James A. Hemphill
    Counsel of Record
Graves, Dougherty, Hearon & Moody, PC
401 Congress Avenue
Suite 2700
Austin, TX 78701

jhemphill@gdhm.com
512-480-5762
Party name: Legal Scholars

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543