Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-947
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-947
Title:Idaho State Tax Commission, Petitioner
v.
Noell Industries, Inc.
Docketed:January 14, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Idaho
   Case Numbers:(46941)
   Decision Date:May 22, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:August 14, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 11 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 16, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 21 2021Waiver of right of respondent Noell Industries, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 26 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Idaho State Tax Commission
Blanket Consent
Jan 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 12 2021Brief amicus curiae of Multistate Tax Commission filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nathan Henrie Nielson
    Counsel of Record
ldaho Office of the Attomey General
P.O. Box 36
Boise, ID 83722-0410

nathan.nielson@tax.idaho.gov
2085054954
Party name: Idaho State Tax Commission
Attorneys for Respondent
Richard Glenn Smith
    Counsel of Record
Hawley Troxell Ennis & Hawley LLP
PO Box 1617
Boise, ID 83701

rsmith@hawleytroxell.com
2083446000
Party name: Noell Industries, Inc.
Other
Brian Alan Hamer
    Counsel of Record
Multistate Tax Commission
444 North Capitol Street NW, Suite 425
Washington, DC 20001

bhamer@MTC.gov
7733726404
Party name: Multistate Tax Commission

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543