Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-941
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-941
Title:Gregory Atkins, et al., Petitioners
v.
Kenneth Williams, Medical Director, Tennessee Department of Correction
Docketed:January 13, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-6243)
   Decision Date:August 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 08 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 12, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 12, 2021 to March 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 26 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 12, 2021.
Mar 12 2021Brief of respondent Kenneth Williams in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Mar 31 2021Reply of petitioners Gregory Atkins, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 19 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael Joseph Wall
    Counsel of Record
Branstetter, Stranch & Jennings, PLLC
223 Rosa L. Parks Avenue, Suite 200
Nashville, TN 37203

michaelw@bsjfirm.com
615-254-8801
Party name: Gregory Atkins, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Sarah Keeton Campbell
    Counsel of Record
Tennessee Office of the Attorney General
500 Dr. Martin L. King, Jr., Blvd.
Nashville, TN 37243

Sarah.Campbell@ag.tn.gov
(615) 532-6026
Party name: Kenneth Williams

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543