Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-940
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-940
Title:Alaska, Petitioner
v.
Sean Wright
Docketed:January 13, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-35543)
   Decision Date:September 2, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 9, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 07 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 12, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 12, 2021 to March 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 15, 2021.
Feb 12 2021Brief amici curiae of States of Indiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 15 2021Brief of respondent Sean Wright in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2021Reply of petitioner Alaska filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Apr 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/23/2021.
Apr 26 2021Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. Opinion per curiam. (Detached Opinion)
May 28 2021JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Donald Earl Soderstrom
    Counsel of Record
Alaska Department of Law, Office of Criminal Appeals
1031 W. 4th Avenue, Suite 200
Anchorage, AK 99501

donald.soderstrom@alaska.gov
9072696260
Party name: Alaska
Tamara Eve DeLuciaState of Alaska Office of the Attorney General
1031 W. 4th Ave Ste 200
Anchorage, AK 99501

tamara.delucia@alaska.gov
9072696260
Party name: Alaska
Attorneys for Respondent
Stuart Banner
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law Supreme Court Clinic
405 Hilgard Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90095

banner@law.ucla.edu
3102068506
Party name: Sean Wright
Other
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: States of Indiana, Louisiana, Alabama, Arizona, Connecticut, Idaho, Kansas, Kentucky, Michigan, Mississippi, Montana, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, Pennsylvania, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, and Utah

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543