Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-902
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-902
Title:Kenneth E. Flick, Petitioner
v.
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General
Docketed:January 5, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-11433)
   Decision Date:July 20, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 21, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 29 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 4, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 4, 2021 to March 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 8, 2021.
Feb 03 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Firearms Policy Coalition, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 03 2021Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation's Center to Keep and Bear Arms filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 04 2021Brief amici curiae of The Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2021Brief of respondent Robert M. Wilkinson, Acting Attorney General in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 22 2021Reply of petitioner Kenneth Flick filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 24 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Apr 19 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Firearms Policy Coalition, et al. GRANTED.
Apr 19 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Alan Gura
    Counsel of Record
Gura PLLC
916 Prince Street
Suite 107
Alexandria, VA 22314

alan@gurapllc.com
7038359085
Party name: Kenneth Flick
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General
Other
Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
    Counsel of Record
Firearms Policy Coalition
1215 K Street, 17th Floor
Sacramento, CA 95814

jgr@fpchq.org
(970) 485-3303
Party name: Firearms Policy Coalition and Firearms Policy Foundation
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
Cody James Wisniewski
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 S. Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227

cody@mslegal.org
303-292-2021
Party name: Mountain States Legal Foundation's Center to Keep and Bear Arms

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543