Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-887
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-887
Title:In Re L. Lin Wood, Jr., Petitioner
Docketed:January 4, 2021
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 30 2020Petition for a writ of mandamus filed. (Response due February 3, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 17 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.
Mar 08 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
L. Lin Wood Jr.
    Counsel of Record
L. Lin Wood, P.C.
P.O. Box 52584
Atlanta, GA 30355-0584

lwood@linwoodlaw.com
4049833284
Party name: L. Lin Wood

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543