Dec 30 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 3, 2021) |
| PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Jan 11 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 3, 2021 to March 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Jan 13 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 5, 2021. |
| |
Jan 29 2021 | Brief amici curiae of National Consumer Bankruptcy Rights Center and National Association of Consumer Bankruptcy Attorneys filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Feb 02 2021 | Brief amici curiae of Consumer Bankruptcy and Student Loan Academics filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Feb 03 2021 | Brief amicus curiae of Center for Responsible Lending filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Feb 12 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 5, 2021 to April 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Feb 16 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 5, 2021. |
| |
Mar 29 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 5, 2021 to May 7, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Mar 29 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 7, 2021. |
| |
May 07 2021 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
| Proof of ServiceMain Document |
May 13 2021 | Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from May 25, 2021 to June 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
May 17 2021 | Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until June 1, 2021 granted. |
| |
May 28 2021 | Reply of petitioner Thelma G. McCoy filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Jun 01 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021. |
| |
Jun 21 2021 | Petition DENIED. |
| |