Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-883
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-883
Title:Donald J. Trump, Petitioner
v.
Wisconsin Elections Commission, et al.
Docketed:January 4, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3414)
   Decision Date:December 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 30 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 3, 2021)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 30 2020Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioner.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 11 2021Motion to expedite consideration filed by petitioner DENIED
Jan 15 2021Waiver of right of respondents Wisconsin Elections Commission, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 19 2021Waiver of right of respondent Satya Rhodes-Conway, Maribeth Witzel-Behl, and Scott McDonell to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 20 2021Waiver of right of respondent Governor Tony Evers to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 21 2021Waiver of right of respondents Wisconsin State Conference NAACP; Dorothy Harrell; Wendell J. Harris, Sr.; Earnestine Moss to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 21 2021Waiver of right of respondent Democratic National Commitee to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 22 2021Waiver of right of respondents Cory Mason, Mayor of the City of Racine, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 22 2021Waiver of right of respondents Cory Mason, Mayor of the City of Racine, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 25 2021Waiver of right of respondent George L. Christenson, Julietta Henry to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 27 2021Waiver of right of respondent Wisconsin Elections Commission, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 27 2021Waiver of right of respondent Wisconsin Elections Commission, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 09 2021Supplemental brief of petitioner Donald J. Trump filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 17 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.
Mar 08 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William Bock III
    Counsel of Record
Kroger, Gardis & Regas, LLP
111 Monument Circle
Suite 900
Indianapolis, IN 46204-5125

wbock@kgrlaw.com
3176929000
Party name: Donald J. Trump
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas Charles Bellavia
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Department of Justice
17 W. Main Street
PO Box 7857
Madison, WI 53707-7857

bellaviatc@doj.state.wi.us
6082668690
Party name: Wisconsin Elections Commission, et al.
John M. Devaney
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
700 Thirteenth Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

jdevaney@perkinscoie.com
202-654-6200
Party name: Democratic National Commitee
David Ray Gault
    Counsel of Record
Dane County Corporation Counsel
210 Martin Luther Luther King, Jr. Blvd., Room 419
Madison, WI 53703

gault@countyofdane.com
6088524881
Party name: Dane County Clerk and Dane County Board of Canvassers
Joseph Salter Goode
    Counsel of Record
Laffey, Leitner & Goode LLC
325 E. Chicago St., Suite 200
Milwaukee, WI 53202

jgoode@llgmke.com
4143127181
Party name: Wisconsin State Conference NAACP; Dorothy Harrell; Wendell J. Harris, Sr.; Earnestine Moss
Andrew Alston Jones
    Counsel of Record
Hansen Reynolds LLC
301 N. Broadway
Suite 400
Milwaukee, WI 53202

ajones@hansenreynolds.com
4144557676
Party name: George L. Christenson, Julietta Henry
Jeffrey A. Mandell
    Counsel of Record
Stafford Rosenbaum, LLP
222 West Washington Avenue
Suite 900
Madison, WI 53703

jmandell@staffordlaw.com
608-210-6303
Party name: Governor Tony Evers
Michael P. May
    Counsel of Record
Boardman & Clark LLP
One S. Pinckney Street, Suite 400
Madison, WI 53701

mmay@boardmanclark.com
608-286-7161
Party name: Satya Rhodes-Conway, Maribeth Witzel-Behl, and Scott McDonell
Daniel S. LenzLawton & Cates, S.C.
345 W. Washington Ave., Suite 201
Madison, WI 53703

dlenz@lawtoncates.com
608-282-6200
Party name: Cory Mason, Mayor of the City of Racine, et al.
Other
John M. DevaneyPerkins Coie LLP
700 Thirteenth Street NW Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

jdevaney@perkinscoie.com
202-654-6200
Party name: Governor Tony Evers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543