Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-882
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-882
Title:Donald J. Trump, et al., Petitioners
v.
Joseph R. Biden, et al.
Docketed:January 4, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Wisconsin
   Case Numbers:(2020AP2038)
   Decision Date:December 14, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 29 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 3, 2021)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 29 2020Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioners.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 04 2021Amicus brief of Todd C. Bank not accepted for filing. (Brief rejected and docket corrected January 19, 2021)
Jan 11 2021Motion to expedite consideration filed by petitioners DENIED
Jan 15 2021Waiver of right of respondents Ann S. Jacobs, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 19 2021Amicus brief of Todd C. Bank not accepted for filing. (February 17, 2021)
Jan 20 2021Waiver of right of respondents Dane County Clerk and Dane County Board of Canvassers to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 21 2021Waiver of right of respondents Joseph R. Biden and Kamala D. Harris to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 25 2021Waiver of right of respondents Milwaukee County Clerk, Milwaukee County Board of Canvassers to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 17 2021Amicus brief of Todd C. Bank not accepted for filing. (February 18, 2021)
Feb 18 2021Amicus brief of Todd C. Bank not accepted for filing. (March 10, 2021)
Feb 22 2021Petition DENIED.
Mar 15 2021Amicus brief of Todd C. Bank not accepted for filing. (March 25, 2021)
Mar 26 2021Amicus brief of Todd C. Bank submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
James Roberts Troupis
    Counsel of Record
Troupis Law Office LLC
4126 Timber Lane
Cross Plains, WI 53528

judgetroupis@gmail.com
(608) 305-4889
Party name: Donald J. Trump, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas Charles Bellavia
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Department of Justice
17 W. Main Street
PO Box 7857
Madison, WI 53707-7857

bellaviatc@doj.state.wi.us
6082668690
Party name: Ann S. Jacobs and Wisconsin Elections Commission
John M. Devaney
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
700 Thirteenth Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

jdevaney@perkinscoie.com
202-654-6200
Party name: Joseph R. Biden and Kamala D. Harris
David Ray Gault
    Counsel of Record
Dane County Corporation Counsel
210 Martin Luther Luther King, Jr. Blvd., Room 419
Madison, WI 53703

gault@countyofdane.com
6088524881
Party name: Dane County Clerk and Dane County Board of Canvassers
Andrew Alston Jones
    Counsel of Record
Hansen Reynolds LLC
301 N. Broadway
Suite 400
Milwaukee, WI 53202

ajones@hansenreynolds.com
4144557676
Party name: Milwaukee County Clerk, Milwaukee County Board of Canvassers
Other
Todd Charles Bank
    Counsel of Record
Todd C. Bank; Todd C. Bank, Attorney at Law, P.C.
119-40 Union Turnpike
Fourth Floor
Kew Gardens, NY 11415

tbank@toddbanklaw.com
(718) 520-7125
Party name: Todd C. Bank

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543