Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-88
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-88
Title:HZNP Finance Limited, et al., Petitioners
v.
Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Docketed:July 29, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-2149, 2017-2152, 2017-2153, 2017-2202, 2017-2203, 2017-2206)
   Decision Date:October 10, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:February 25, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 24 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 28, 2020)
PetitionProof of Service
Aug 11 2020Waiver of right of respondent Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 31 2020Response Requested. (Due September 30, 2020)
Sep 30 2020Brief of respondent Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 14 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/30/2020.
Oct 22 2020Reply of petitioners Hznp Finance Limited, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 02 2020Petition DENIED. Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Caryn Carson Borg-Breen
    Counsel of Record
Green, Griffith & Borg-Breen, LLP
676 North Michigan Avenue, Suite 3900
Chicago, IL 60611

cborg-breen@greengriffith.com
312-883-8040
Party name: Hznp Finance Limited, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
John Christopher Rozendaal
    Counsel of Record
Sterne, Kessler, Goldstein & Fox P.L.L.C.
1100 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jcrozendaal@sternekessler.com
2027728747
Party name: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543