Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-859
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-859
Title:In Re William Feehan, Petitioner
Docketed:December 29, 2020
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 15 2020Petition for a writ of mandamus filed. (Response due January 28, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2020Letter of December 30, 2020 from counsel for petitioner submitted.
Main Document
Jan 21 2021Waiver of right of respondent Governor Tony Evers to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 27 2021Waiver of right of respondent Wisconsin Elections Commission, Ann Jacobs, Mark Thomsen, Marge Bostelman, Julie Glancey, Dean Knudson, and Robert Spindell, Jr. to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021.
Mar 01 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Howard Kleinhendler
    Counsel of Record
Howard Kleinhendler Esquire
369 Lexington Avenue
12th Floor
New York, NY 10017

howard@kleinhendler.com
9177931188
Party name: William Feehan
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey A. Mandell
    Counsel of Record
Stafford Rosenbaum, LLP
222 West Washington Avenue
Suite 900
Madison, WI 53703

jmandell@staffordlaw.com
608-210-6303
Party name: Governor Tony Evers
Sean Michael Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Department of Justice
17 W. Main Street
P.O. Box 7857
Madison, WI 53707-7857

Murphysm@doj.state.wi.us
312-504-7549
Party name: Wisconsin Elections Commission, Ann Jacobs, Mark Thomsen, Marge Bostelman, Julie Glancey, Dean Knudson, and Robert Spindell, Jr.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543