Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-858
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-858
Title:In Re Tyler Bowyer, et al., Petitioners
Docketed:December 29, 2020
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 15 2020Petition for a writ of mandamus filed. (Response due January 28, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2020Letter of December 30, 2020 from counsel for petitioner submitted.
Main Document
Feb 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021.
Mar 01 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Howard Kleinhendler
    Counsel of Record
Howard Kleinhendler Esquire
369 Lexington Avenue
12th Floor
New York, NY 10017

howard@kleinhendler.com
9177931188
Party name: Tyler Bowyer, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543