Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-853
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-853
Title:Andrei Iancu, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office, Petitioner
v.
Fall Line Patents, LLC, et al.
Docketed:December 28, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1956)
   Decision Date:July 28, 2020
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:September 29, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 23 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 27, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 27 2021Brief of respondent Apple Inc. in support filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021.
Feb 22 2021Response Requested. (Due March 24, 2021)
Mar 05 2021Brief of respondent Fall Line Patents, LLC in support filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 19 2021Brief of respondent HemoSonics LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 22 2021Brief of respondent James Gelsin Marx in support submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 07 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/23/2021.
Jun 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Andrei Iancu, Under Secretary of Commerce For Intellectual Property and Director, U.S. Patent and Trademark Office,
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew James Antonelli
    Counsel of Record
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
4306 Yoakum Blvd., Ste. 450
Houston, TX 77006

matt@ahtlawfirm.com
713-581-3000
Party name: Fall Line Patents, LLC
Edward Maughan Cannon
    Counsel of Record
Knobbe, Martens, Olson & Bear LLP
2040 Main Street, 14th Floor
Irvine, CA 92614

ted.cannon@knobbe.com
949-760-0404
Party name: James Gelsin Marx
Nicole A. Saharsky
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

nsaharsky@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3052
Party name: HemoSonics LLC
Thomas Gregory Sprankling
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
2600 El Camino Real, Suite 400
Palo Alto, CA 94306

Thomas.Sprankling@wilmerhale.com
650-858-6000
Party name: Apple Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543