Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-850
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-850
Title:Big Time Vapes, Incorporated, et al., Petitioners
v.
Food and Drug Administration, et al.
Docketed:December 28, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-60921)
   Decision Date:June 25, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:August 25, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 18 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 27, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 11 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 27, 2021 to February 26, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 26, 2021.
Jan 26 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by 19 National and State Electronic Nicotine Delivery System Product Advocacy Associations.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 26, 2021 to March 29, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 29, 2021.
Mar 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 29, 2021 to April 28, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 28, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jerad Wayne Najvar
    Counsel of Record
Najvar Law Firm, PLLC
2180 North Loop West
Suite 255
Houston, TX 77018

jerad@najvarlaw.com
(281) 404-4696
Party name: Big Time Vapes, Incorporated, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Food and Drug Administration, et al.
Other
J. Gregory Troutman
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Law Office, PLLC.
4205 Springhurst Boulevard
Suite 201
Louisville, KY 40241

jgtatty@yahoo.com
5027419491
Party name: 19 National and State Electronic Nicotine Delivery System Product Advocacy Associations

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543