Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-8455
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-8455
Title:April Ledford, Petitioner
v.
Eastern Band of Cherokee Indians
Docketed:June 30, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2232)
   Decision Date:April 26, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 25 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 30, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jul 13 2021Waiver of right of respondent Eastern Band of Cherokee Indians to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
April LedfordP.O. Box 2150
Bryson City, NC 28713

Party name: April Ledford
Attorneys for Respondent
Dale A. CurridenThe Van Winkle Law Firm
11 N. Market Street
Asheville, NC 28801

dcurriden@vwlawfirm.com
828-258-2991
Party name: Eastern Band of Cherokee Indians

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543