Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-8335
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-8335
Title:George A. Christian, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:June 16, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PC-2021-75)
   Decision Date:March 23, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 04 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 16, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Aug 05 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Aug 16 2021Response Requested. (Due September 15, 2021)
Sep 15 2021Brief of respondent Oklahoma in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Sep 30 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021.
Oct 18 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
George A. Christian Jr.P.O. Box 260
Lexington, OK 73051

Party name: George A. Christian
Attorneys for Respondent
Julie Armendia Pittman
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 N.E. 21th Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

julie.pittman@oag.ok.gov
(918) 581-2588
Party name: Oklahoma
Mithun MansinghaniSolicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543