Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-8333 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-8333 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Carman Deck, Petitioner
v.
Paul Blair, Warden, et al.
Docketed:June 17, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2055)
   Decision Date:October 19, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:January 13, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 14 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 19, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jul 19 2021Brief of respondents Paul Blair, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Aug 31 2021Reply of petitioner Carman Deck filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 04 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth Unger Carlyle
    Counsel of Record
Carlyle Parish LLC
6320 Brookside Plz., Box 516
Kansas City, MO 64113

elizabeth@carlyleparishlaw.com
8165256540
Party name: Carman Deck
Attorneys for Respondents
Katharine Anne Dolin
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Missouri Attorney General
PO Box 899
Jefferson City, MO 65102

katharine.dolin@ago.mo.gov
573-751-0475
Party name: Paul Blair, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543