Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-833
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-833
Title:William Todd Coontz, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 21, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-4167)
   Decision Date:April 17, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:July 28, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 17 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 20, 2021)
PetitionAppendixAppendixOtherCertificate of Word Count
Jan 12 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 20 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Glenn Barger
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Traurig
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
1750 Tysons Blvd., Suite 1000
McLean, VA 22102

bargerd@gtlaw.com
703-749-1307
Party name: William Todd Coontz
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. PrelogarActing Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543