Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-828
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-828
Title:Federal Bureau of Investigation, et al., Petitioners
v.
Yassir Fazaga, et al.
Docketed:December 18, 2020
Linked with 21A27
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(12-56867, 13-55017)
   Decision Date:July 20, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 17 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 19, 2021)
PetitionProof of Service
Dec 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 19, 2021 to March 22, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 22, 2021.
Jan 05 2021Waiver of right of respondents James Elmer Mitchell and John Jessen not accepted for filing (waiver filed in wrong case and removed from the docket 3/5/21).
Jan 18 2021Brief of respondents Pat Rose, Paul Allen and Kevin Armstrong in support filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 19 2021Brief of respondents J. Stephen Tidwell and Barbara Walls in support filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 22, 2021 to April 21, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 21, 2021.
Apr 21 2021Brief of respondents Yassir Fazaga, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/27/2021.
May 11 2021Reply of petitioners Federal Bureau of Investigation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/3/2021.
Jun 07 2021Petition GRANTED.
Jul 01 2021Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners brief on the merits is extended to and including July 30, 2021. The time to file respondents' briefs on the merits is extended to and including September 21, 2021.
Jul 30 2021Brief of respondents J. Stephen Tidwell and Barbara Walls in support of petitioners filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 30 2021Brief of respondents Paul Allen, Kevin Armstrong, and Pat Rose in support of reversal filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 30 2021Brief of petitioners Federal Bureau of Investigation, et al. filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jul 30 2021Joint appendix filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 06 2021Brief amicus curiae of Professor Laura K. Donohue in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Monday, November 8, 2021.
Aug 25 2021Application (21A27) to file a response brief on the merits in excess of the word limit, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 01 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Sep 02 2021Application (21A27) granted by Justice Kagan to file a response brief on the merits in excess of the word limit.
Sep 21 2021CIRCULATED
Sep 21 2021Brief of respondents Yassir Fazaga, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Bureau of Investigation, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ahilan T. Arulanantham
    Counsel of Record
UCLA SCHOOL OF LAW
385 Charles Young Drive East
Los Angeles, CA 90095

arulanantham@law.ucla.edu
310-825-1029
Party name: Yassir Fazaga, et al.
Catherine Mary Agnes Carroll
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

catherine.carroll@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: J. Stephen Tidwell and Barbara Walls in support of petitioners
Alexander Howard Cote
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn LLP
333 S. Grand Avenue, 38th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

acote@winston.com
(213) 615-1993
Party name: Paul Allen, Kevin Armstrong, and Pat Rose in support of reversal
Other
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

shay.dvoretzky@skadden.com
202-371-7370
Party name: Professor Laura K. Donohue

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543