Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-819
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-819
Title:Duy T. Mai, Petitioner
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:December 17, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-36071)
   Decision Date:March 11, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:September 10, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 09 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 19, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of Service
Dec 22 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 19, 2021 to February 18, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 18, 2021.
Jan 19 2021Brief amici curiae of Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 18, 2021 to March 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 19, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Vitaliy A Kertchen
    Counsel of Record
Kertchen Law, PLLC
917 S 10th St
Tacoma, WA 98405

vitaliy@kertchenlaw.com
253-905-8415
Party name: Duy T. Mai
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States, et al.
Other
Robert Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West
Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

rob@wjopc.com
703-356-5070
Party name: Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of California, Inc., and Heller Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543