Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-816
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-816
Title:In Re Coreco Ja'Qan Pearson, et al., Petitioners
Docketed:December 15, 2020
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 11 2020Petition for a writ of mandamus filed. (Response due January 14, 2021)
PetitionPetitionPetition
Dec 15 2020Supplemental brief of petitioner Coreco Ja'Qan Pearson, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 18 2020Motion to Consolidate and Expedite Consideration of the Emergency Petition and, to Expedite Merits Briefing and Oral Argument in the Event that the Court Grants the Petition, and to Expedite Consideration of this Motion filed by petitioner Coreco Ja'Qan Pearson, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 30 2020Letter of December 30, 2020 from counsel for petitioner submitted.
Main Document
Jan 11 2021Motion to expedite consideration filed by petitioners DENIED
Jan 14 2021Waiver of right of respondents State of Georgia, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 19 2021Motion to dismiss the petition pursuant to Rule 46 filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 11 2021Petition Dismissed - Rule 46.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Howard Kleinhendler
    Counsel of Record
Howard Kleinhendler Esquire
369 Lexington Avenue
12th Floor
New York, NY 10017

howard@kleinhendler.com
9177931188
Party name: Coreco Ja'Qan Pearson, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Andrew Alan Pinson
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Georgia Attorney General
40 Capital Square SW
Atlanta, GA 30334-1300

apinson@law.ga.gov
404-458-3409
Party name: State of Georgia, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543