Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-815
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-815
Title:Timothy King, et al., Petitioners
v.
Gretchen Whitmer, Governor of Michigan, et al.
Docketed:December 15, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2205)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 11 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due January 14, 2021)
PetitionAppendix
Dec 13 2020Proposal under Rule 32.3 to lodge new evidence with the Clerk filed by counsel for petitioners.
Dec 15 2020Supplemental brief of petitioner Timothy King filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 18 2020Motion to Consolidate and Expedite Consideration of the Emergency Petition and, to Expedite Merits Briefing and Oral Argument in the Event that the Court Grants the Petition, and to Expedite Consideration of this Motion filed by petitioner Timothy King.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 18 2020Amicus brief of Todd C. Bank not accepted for filing. (January 08, 2021)
Dec 28 2020Response to motion from respondent Gretchen Whitmer, Governor, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 30 2020Letter to Clerk of Timothy King submitted.
Main Document
Jan 08 2021Amicus brief of Todd C. Bank submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 11 2021Motion to expedite consideration filed by petitioners DENIED
Jan 14 2021Brief of Gretchen Whitmer, Governor; Jocelyn Benson, Secretary of State; and the Michigan Board of State Canvassers in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 14 2021Brief of City of Detroit in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Howard Kleinhendler
    Counsel of Record
Howard Kleinhendler Esquire
369 Lexington Avenue
12th Floor
New York, NY 10017

howard@kleinhendler.com
9177931188
Party name: Timothy King
Attorneys for Respondents
David H. Fink
    Counsel of Record
Fink Bressack, PLLC
38500 Woodward Ave., Ste. 350
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

dfink@finkbressack.com
2489712500
Party name: City of Detroit
Fadwa A. Hammoud
    Counsel of Record
Michigan Department of Attorney General
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI 48909

HammoudF1@michigan.gov
517-335-7628
Party name: Gretchen Whitmer, Governor; Jocelyn Benson, Secretary of State; and the Michigan Board of State Canvassers
Other
Todd Charles Bank
    Counsel of Record
Todd C. Bank, Attorney at Law, P.C.
119-40 Union Turnpike
Fourth Floor
Kew Gardens, NY 11415

tbank@toddbanklaw.com
(718) 520-7125
Party name: Todd C. Bank

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543