Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-812
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-812
Title:Lisa M. Folajtar, Petitioner
v.
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al.
Docketed:December 15, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1687)
   Decision Date:November 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 11 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 14, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 14, 2021 to February 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 31 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 16, 2021. See Rule 30.1.
Jan 12 2021Brief amici curiae of Firearms Policy Foundation, California Gun Rights Foundation, Second Amendment Foundation, and Madison Society Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 14 2021Brief amicus curiae of The American Constitutional Rights Union filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 14 2021Brief amici curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 14 2021Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation's Center to Keep and Bear Arms filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 16, 2021 to March 17, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 17, 2021.
Mar 12 2021Brief amicus curiae of Neal Goldfarb filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 17 2021Brief of respondents Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 30 2021Reply of petitioner Lisa Folajtar filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Apr 19 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dthompson@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Lisa Folajtar
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al.
Other
Neal Goldfarb
    Counsel of Record
1301 Fairmont St., NW
Washington, DC 20009

goldfarbneal@gmail.com
2022627886
Party name: Neal Goldfarb
David T. Hardy
    Counsel of Record
8987 E. Tanque Verde
No. 265
Tucson, AZ 85749

dthardy@mindspring.com
520-749-0241
Party name: Firearms Policy Foundation, California Gun Rights Foundation, Second Amendment Foundation, and Madison Society Foundation
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jack Park
616-B Green Street
Gainesville, GA 30501

jjp@jackparklaw.com
470-892-6444
Party name: The American Constitutional Rights Union
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
Cody James Wisniewski
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 S. Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227

cody@mslegal.org
303-292-2021
Party name: Mountain States Legal Foundation's Center to Keep and Bear Arms

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543