Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-8107
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-8107
Title:Gregory Turner, Petitioner
v.
Merit Systems Protection Board
Docketed:May 21, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1650)
   Decision Date:February 8, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 02 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 21, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jun 09 2021Waiver of right of respondent Merit Systems Protection Board to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 17 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory Turner5379 River Stone Drive
Memphis, TN 38125-4348

Party name: Gregory Turner
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Merit Systems Protection Board

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543