Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-810
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-810
Title:Mike Kelly, United States Congressman, et al., Petitioners
v.
Pennsylvania, et al.
Docketed:December 15, 2020
Linked with 20A98
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Middle District
   Case Numbers:(68 MAP 2020)
   Decision Date:November 28, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 03 2020Application (20A98) for injunctive relief, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 03 2020Response to application (20A98) requested by Justice Alito, due Tuesday, December 8, by 9 a.m. (docket entry updated 12/6/20)
Dec 04 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Landmark Legal Foundation.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 07 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by P. Michael Jones, et al.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 07 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by John Joyce, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 07 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by The Republican Party of Pennsylvania.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 07 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Lehigh Valley Tea Party.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 08 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Jay Costa, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Dec 08 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Eagle Forum Education and Legal Defense Fund.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Dec 08 2020Response to application from respondents Pennsylvania, et al filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 08 2020Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Brief of The Republican Party of Pennsylvania not accepted for filing. (December 08, 2020 - to be resubmitted by proper party)
Dec 08 2020Reply of applicants Mike Kelly, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Dec 08 2020Application (20A98) referred to the Court.
Dec 08 2020Application (20A98) denied by the Court.
Dec 08 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Roy S. Moore, et al.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 11 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 14, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 11 2020Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioners.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 21 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Carter Phillips, et al.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 23 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by 28 Current Members of the House of Representatives.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 11 2021Motion to expedite consideration filed by petitioners DENIED.
Jan 13 2021Waiver of right of respondents Commonwealth of Pennsylvania; Thomas W. Wolf, in his official capacity as Governor of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania; and Kathy Boockvar, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 20 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by 28 Current Members of the House of Representatives GRANTED.
Feb 22 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Gregory H. Teufel
    Counsel of Record
OGC Law, LLC
1575 McFarland Rd., Ste. 201
Pittsburgh, PA 15216

gteufel@ogclaw.net
4122534622
Party name: Mike Kelly
Attorneys for Respondents
Robert Andrew Wiygul
    Counsel of Record
Hangley Aronchick Segal Pudlin & Schiller
One Logan Square, 27th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103

rwiygul@hangley.com
215-496-7042
Party name: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania; Thomas W. Wolf, in his official capacity as Governor of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania; and Kathy Boockvar, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Other
Michael Francis Smith
    Counsel of Record
The Smith Appellate Law Firm
1717 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W.
Suite 1025
Washington, DC 20006

smith@smithpllc.com
2024542860
Party name: Amici Curiae 28 Current Members of the House of Representatives

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543