Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-8043 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-8043 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Carl Wayne Buntion, Petitioner
v.
Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:May 17, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-70004)
   Decision Date:December 14, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 12 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 16, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jun 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 16, 2021 to July 16, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 16, 2021.
Jul 16 2021Brief of respondent Bobby Lumpkin, Dir., TX DCJ in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 03 2021Reply of petitioner Carl Wayne Buntion filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 05 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021Petition DENIED. Statement of Justice Breyer respecting the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David R. Dow
    Counsel of Record
University of Houston Law Ctr.
4604 Calhoun Road
Houston, TX 77204-6060

ddow@central.uh.edu
7137432171
Party name: Carl Wayne Buntion
Attorneys for Respondent
Cara Blossom Garcia Hanna
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of Texas
PO Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711-2548

cara.hanna@oag.texas.gov
5129361400
Party name: Bobby Lumpkin, Dir., TX DCJ
Gwendolyn Suzanne VindellTexas Attorney General's Office
300 W. 15th St.
Austin, TX 78701

gwendolyn.vindell2@oag.texas.gov
5124753448
Party name: Bobby Lumpkin, Dir., TX DCJ

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543