Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-803
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-803
Title:Morgan Joseph Langan, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 15, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1057)
   Decision Date:May 6, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:July 21, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 08 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 14, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 11 2021Waiver of right of respondent State of Arizona to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 12 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 20 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Morgan Joseph LanganP.O. Box 741
Cornville, AZ 86325

(928) 649-1921
Party name: Morgan Langan
Attorneys for Respondent
Drew Curtis Ensign
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
2005 N. Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004

drew.ensign@azag.gov
602-542-5025
Party name: State of Arizona
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543