Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-80
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-80
Title:Diane S. Blodgett, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:July 28, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-2398)
   Decision Date:December 3, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:February 19, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 20 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 27, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 05 2020Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 12 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Diane S. Blodgett3600 Wooddale Ave. S.
#317
St. Louis Park, MN 55416

(952) 797-9441
Party name: Diane Blodgett, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543