Docket for 20-8
|
Jul 06 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 10, 2020) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther | Jul 15 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 10, 2020 to August 26, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jul 16 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 26, 2020, for all respondents. | | | Aug 07 2020 | Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Aug 10 2020 | Brief amici curiae of Public Law Scholars filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Aug 10 2020 | Brief amici curiae of Eleven Bankruptcy Trustees filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Aug 26 2020 | Brief of respondents Susquehanna Capital Group, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Sep 08 2020 | Reply of petitioners Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Sep 09 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. | | | Oct 05 2020 | The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration of this petition. | | | Oct 29 2020 | Motion of petitioners under Rule 46.2(a) for partial dismissal of the petition for a writ of certiorari only with respect to certain respondents. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Dec 02 2020 | Motion to dismiss under Rule 46.2 GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari is dismissed only with respect to the respondents identified in the motion for partial dismissal filed October 29, 2020. | | | Mar 12 2021 | Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 31 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021. | | | Mar 31 2021 | Supplemental brief of petitioners Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 01 2021 | Supplemental brief of respondents SAL Equity Trading, GP f/k/a Susquehanna Capital Group and Susquehanna Investment Group filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 19 2021 | Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. | | |
|