Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-794
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-794
Title:Servotronics, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Rolls-Royce PLC, et al.
Docketed:December 11, 2020
Linked with 20A127
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1847)
   Decision Date:September 22, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 07 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 11, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 31 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 11, 2021 to February 10, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 03 2021Response to motion from petitioner Servotronics, Inc. filed.
Main Document
Jan 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 10, 2021, for all respondents.
Jan 04 2021Application (20A127) for reconsideration of Clerk's action extending the time to file a response to the petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main Document
Jan 05 2021Brief amicus curiae of International Institute for Conflict Prevention & Resolution in Support of Petitioner filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 05 2021Response to application (20A127) from respondent The Boeing Company filed.
Main Document
Jan 11 2021Brief amicus curiae of Atlanta International Arbitration Society filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 25 2021Application (20A127) denied by Justice Barrett.
Feb 10 2021Brief of respondents Rolls-Royce, PLC and The Boeing Company in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2021Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the filing of a reply pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Feb 17 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.
Mar 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 22 2021Petition GRANTED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
May 06 2021Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 06 2021Brief of petitioner Servotronics, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 12 2021Brief amicus curiae of Federal Arbitration Inc. (FEDARB) filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 12 2021Motion for an extension of time to file respondents' briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
May 13 2021Brief amicus curiae of The International Court of Arbitration of the International Chamber of Commerce in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2021Brief amicus curiae of Professor Yanbai Andrea Wang in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2021Brief amicus curiae of Professor George A. Bermann filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 24 2021Motion of respondents for an extension of time to file respondents briefs on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including June 21, 2021.
Jun 21 2021Brief of respondent Rolls-Royce PLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 21 2021Brief of respondent The Boeing Company filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 25 2021Brief amicus curiae of International Arbitration Center in Tokyo filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 28 2021Brief amici curiae of The General Aviation Manufacturers Association, Inc., and the Aerospace Industries Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 28 2021Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States and Business Roundtable filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 28 2021Brief amici curiae of Dr. Xu Guojian, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of Halliburton Company filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of Institute of International Bankers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 28 2021Motion of United States for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 13 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, October 5, 2021.
Jul 21 2021Reply of petitioner Servotronics, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 7th Circuit.
Jul 29 2021The record from the U.S.C.A. 7th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Aug 02 2021Motion of United States for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Aug 03 2021CIRCULATED
Aug 23 2021The time for oral argument is allotted as follows: 30 minutes for petitioner, 20 minutes for respondents, and 15 minutes for the Acting Solicitor General. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this order.
Aug 23 2021Justice Alito is no longer recused in this case.
Sep 08 2021Letter of petitioner notifying the Clerk of intention to file a Rule 46 motion to dismiss filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Sep 08 2021REMOVED from the October 2021 ARGUMENT CALENDAR.
Sep 24 2021Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 46.1 filed.
Main Document
Sep 29 2021Case Dismissed - Rule 46.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Katherine Burks Posner
    Counsel of Record
Condon & Forsyth LLP
7 Times Square
18th Floor
New York, NY 10036

kposner@condonlaw.com
2124909100
Party name: Servotronics, Inc.
Stephen R. Stegich IIICondon & Forsyth
7 Times Square, 18th Floor
7 Times Square Tower
New York, NY 10036

sstegich@condonlaw.com
(212) 490-9100
Party name: Servotronics, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Rolls-Royce PLC
Scott Payne Martin
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
1201 Third Avenue, Suite 4900
Seattle, WA 98101

smartin@perkinscoie.com
2063593600
Party name: The Boeing Company
Other
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Ekaterina Hristova Apostolova
    Counsel of Record
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer Singapore Pte Ltd
10 Collyer Quay 42-01
Ocean Financial Centre
Singapore, XX 049315

kate.apostolova@freshfields.com
+6581830632
Party name: The International Court of Arbitration of the International Chamber of Commerce
Jeffrey S. Bucholtz
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

jbucholtz@kslaw.com
202-737-0500
Party name: Halliburton Company
Lauren Lacey Haertlein
    Counsel of Record
General Aviation Manufacturers Association
1400 K St NW. Suite 801
Washington, DC 20005

lhaertlein@GAMA.aero
2023931500
Party name: The General Aviation Manufacturers Association, Inc., and the Aerospace Industries Association
Timothy Paul Harkness
    Counsel of Record
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP
601 Lexington Avenue
31st Floor
New York, NY 10022

timothy.harkness@freshfields.com
212-230-4619
Party name: Professor George A. Bermann
Derek T. Ho
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

dho@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7931
Party name: Institute of International Bankers
Katherine Burghardt Kramer
    Counsel of Record
DGW Kramer LLP
One Rockefeller Plaza, Suite 1060
New York, NY 10020

kkramer@dgwllp.com
917-688-2585
Party name: Dr. Xu Guojian, et al.
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
202-261-3378
Party name: Professor Yanbai Andrea Wang
Robert Paul Parker
    Counsel of Record
Rothwell, Figg, Ernst & Manbeck, P.C.
607 14th St. NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20005

rparker@rfem.com
2027836040
Party name: International Arbitration Center in Tokyo
John B. Pinney
    Counsel of Record
Graydon Head & Ritchey LLP
312 Walnut Street Suite 1800
Cincinnati, OH 45202

jpinney@graydon.com
513-629-2730
Party name: International Institute for Conflict Prevention & Resolution in Support of Petitioner
Peter Bowman Rutledge
    Counsel of Record
215 Morton Avenue
Athens, GA 30605

borutledge70@gmail.com
706 206 7183
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States; Business Roundtable
Andrew J. Tuck
    Counsel of Record
Alston and Bird LLP
1201 West Peachtree Street
Atlanta, GA 30309

andy.tuck@alston.com
404-881-7134
Party name: Atlanta International Arbitration Society
Henry Sabath Weisburg
    Counsel of Record
Shearman and Sterling LLP
599 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10022

HWeisburg@Shearman.com
212-848-4000
Party name: Federal Arbitration Inc. (FEDARB)

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543