Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-787
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-787
Title:Preserve Responsible Shoreline Management, et al., Petitioners
v.
City of Bainbridge Island, Washington, et al.
Docketed:December 9, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Washington, Division 1
   Case Numbers:(80092-2-I)
   Decision Date:December 9, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:July 8, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 03 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 8, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 10 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Preserve Responsible Shoreline Management, et al.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jan 05 2021Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2021Waiver of right of respondent Washington State Department of Ecology to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Goldwater Institute; Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 08 2021Brief of respondent City of Bainbridge Island in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2021Reply of petitioners Preserve Responsible Shoreline Management, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Glenn Evans Roper
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

GERoper@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Preserve Responsible Shoreline Management, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Peter Benjamin Gonick
    Counsel of Record
Attorney General of Washington
1125 Washington St SE
PO Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504

peterg@atg.wa.gov
3607536245
Party name: Washington State Department of Ecology
Walter Scott Snyder
    Counsel of Record
Ogden Murphy Wallace
901 5th Avenue, Suite 3500
Seattle, WA 98164

ssnyder@omwlaw.com
2064477000
Party name: City of Bainbridge Island
Other
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
Timothy Mason Sandefur
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater Institute
500 E. Coronado Road
Phoenix, AZ 85004

tsandefur@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute; Cato Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543