Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-7846
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-7846
Title:Angel Ortiz, Petitioner
v.
Dennis Breslin, Superintendent, Queensboro Correctional Facility, et al.
Docketed:April 26, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of New York
   Case Numbers:(75)
   Decision Date:November 23, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 26, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 17 2021Waiver of right of respondent Dennis Breslin, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/3/2021.
May 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Restorative Action Alliance, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 28 2021Response Requested. (Due June 28, 2021)
Jun 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 28, 2021 to July 28, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 28, 2021.
Jul 28 2021Brief of respondents Dennis Breslin, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 10 2021Reply of petitioner Angel Ortiz filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Sep 03 2021Rescheduled.
Oct 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 05 2021Rescheduled.
Oct 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021.
Oct 12 2021Rescheduled.
Oct 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Oct 25 2021Rescheduled.
Nov 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/5/2021.
Nov 01 2021Rescheduled.
Nov 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/12/2021.
Nov 09 2021Rescheduled.
Nov 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/19/2021.
Nov 15 2021Rescheduled.
Nov 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.
Nov 29 2021Rescheduled.
Dec 06 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/10/2021.
Dec 06 2021Rescheduled.
Jan 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 04 2022Rescheduled.
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 10 2022Rescheduled.
Jan 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jan 18 2022Rescheduled.
Feb 11 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022Petition DENIED. Statement of Justice Sotomayor respecting the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lawrence T. Hausman
    Counsel of Record
The Legal Aid Society
199 Water Street
5th Floor
New York, NY 10038

thausman@legal-aid.org
646-584-5885
Party name: Angel Ortiz
Attorneys for Respondents
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: Dennis Breslin, et al.
Brian David GinsbergOffice of the Attorney General
The Capitol
Albany, NY 12224

brian.ginsberg@ag.ny.gov
5187762040
Party name: Dennis Breslin, et al.
Other
Janice Madelyn Bellucci
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Janice M. Bellucci
c/o Restorative Action Alliance, Inc.
282 Katonah Ave., Unit 1017
Katonah, NY 10536

jmbellucci@aol.com
9143621406
Party name: Restorative Action Alliance, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543