Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-783
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-783
Title:Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Board of County Commissioners of Boulder County, et al.
Docketed:December 8, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1330)
   Decision Date:July 7, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 04 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 7, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 31 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 7, 2021 to March 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 5, 2021.
Mar 05 2021Brief of respondents Board of County Commissioners of Boulder County, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 24 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Marco Benjamin Simons
    Counsel of Record
EarthRights International
1612 K Street N.W.
#800
Washington, DC 20006

marco@earthrights.org
202-466-5188
Party name: Board of County Commissioners of Boulder County, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543