Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-78
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-78
Title:In Re Scott Louis YoungBear, Petitioner
Docketed:July 27, 2020
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 17 2020Petition for writ of habeas corpus filed.
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Scott Louis YoungBear1670 Meskwaki Road
Tama, IA 52339

Party name: Scott Louis YoungBear

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543