Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-7798
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-7798
Title:Christopher Williams, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 20, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2235)
   Decision Date:September 30, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 17, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 16 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 20, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
May 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 20, 2021 to June 21, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 21, 2021.
Jun 21 2021Memorandum of respondent United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Mar 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Mar 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/25/2022.
Mar 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2022.
Apr 04 2022Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Wooden v. United States, 595 U. S. ___ (2022).
May 06 2022JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Becky Kurz
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender Office
1000 Walnut, Suite 600
Kansas City, MO 64106

Becky_Kurz@fd.org
8164718282
Party name: Christopher Williams
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543